GA SB45 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-24 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-24 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 3 of Article 3 of Chapter 11 of Title 16 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to invasions of privacy, so as to prohibit the use of a device to film under or through a person's clothing under certain circumstances; to provide for definitions; to provide for penalties; to provide for exceptions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Invasions of Privacy; to film under or through a person's clothing; prohibit the use of a device
Sponsors
Sen. Larry Walker [R] | Sen. Jesse Stone [R] | Sen. Elena Parent [D] | Sen. John Kennedy [R] |
Sen. Blake Tillery [R] | Sen. Bill Cowsert [R] | Rep. Shaw Blackmon [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate Vote #55 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-24 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2017-03-22 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-02-17 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-16 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Senate Hopper |