GA SB45 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-02-18 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 26 of Title 43 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to nurses, so as to revise the requirements for nursing education programs required for licensure as an advanced practice registered nurse, registered professional nurse, or licensed practical nurse; to revise definitions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Nurses; licensure; nursing education programs; revise requirements; definitions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2009-02-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #46 - Passage (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2009-02-18 House Second Readers
2009-02-17 House First Readers
2009-02-12 Senate Passed/Adopted
2009-02-12 Senate Third Read
2009-02-06 Senate Read Second Time
2009-02-05 Senate Committee Favorably Reported
2009-01-27 Senate Read and Referred

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback