GA SB446 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 17-6-4 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the authorization of posting cash bonds generally, furnishing of receipt to person posting bond, recordation of receipt of bond on docket, and disposal of unclaimed bonds, so as to provide for unclaimed cash bonds; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Cash Bonds; unclaimed cash bonds; provide
Sponsors
Sen. Larry Walker [R] | Sen. John Kennedy [R] | Sen. Steve Gooch [R] | Sen. Frank Ginn [R] |
Sen. Butch Miller [R] | Sen. Tyler Harper [R] | Rep. Shaw Blackmon [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-24 - House - House Vote #724 (Y: 137 N: 4 NV: 12 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #600 (Y: 49 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #623 (Y: 48 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #600 (Y: 49 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #623 (Y: 48 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-01 | Effective Date | |
2020-07-29 | Act 520 | |
2020-07-29 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2020-06-24 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-24 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-06-23 | House | House Postponed |
2020-06-22 | House | House Postponed |
2020-06-18 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-06-15 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-03-13 | House | House First Readers |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate Hopper |