GA SB445 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Enrolled on June 29 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Senate Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 7 of Title 12 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to control of soil erosion and sedimentation, so as to authorize certain water and water and sewer authorities to be designated as local issuing authorities for land-disturbing activity permits; to revise a definition; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Soil Erosion and Sedimentation; water and sewer authorities to be designated as local issuing authorities for land-disturbing activity permits; authorize

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #745 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - House Vote #719 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Vote #571 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-29SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2020-06-25SenateSenate Agreed House Amend or Sub
2020-06-24HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2020-06-24HouseHouse Third Readers
2020-06-23HouseHouse Postponed
2020-06-18HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2020-03-13HouseHouse Second Readers
2020-03-12HouseHouse First Readers
2020-03-10SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2020-03-10SenateSenate Third Read
2020-03-09SenateSenate Read Second Time
2020-03-05SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2020-02-26SenateSenate Read and Referred
2020-02-25SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback