GA SB44 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-26 - Act 29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-26 - Act 29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 16 of the O.C.G.A., relating to crimes and offenses, so as to provide for mandatory minimum penalties for violations of the Street Gang Terrorism and Prevention Act; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Street Gang Terrorism and Prevention Act; mandatory minimum penalties for violations; provide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-29 - Senate - Agree To House Substitute: Senate Vote #368 (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - Passage: House Vote #258 (Y: 99 N: 74 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #35 (Y: 31 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Adoption Of Amendment #2 By The Senator From The 2nd: Senate Vote #34 (Y: 23 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Adoption Of Amendment #1 By The Senator From The 41st: Senate Vote #33 (Y: 25 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2023-03-20 - House - Passage: House Vote #258 (Y: 99 N: 74 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #35 (Y: 31 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Adoption Of Amendment #2 By The Senator From The 2nd: Senate Vote #34 (Y: 23 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Adoption Of Amendment #1 By The Senator From The 41st: Senate Vote #33 (Y: 25 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-26 | Act 29 | |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2023-03-20 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2023-03-20 | House | House Third Readers |
2023-03-14 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2023-02-15 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-02-14 | House | House First Readers |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Senate Hopper |