GA SB435 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 2 of Title 31 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Department of Community Health, so as to enact the "Diabetes and Health Improvement Act of 2010"; to provide legislative findings; to establish the Georgia Diabetes Control Office; to provide for a board of trustees; to provide for the establishment of two grant programs to promote a state-wide effort to combat the proliferation of diabetes; to provide for grant criteria; to provide for staff; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
"Diabetes and Health Improvement Act of 2010"; enact; establish Georgia Diabetes Control Office; board of trustees
Sponsors
Sen. Don Balfour [R] | Sen. Greg Goggans [R] | Sen. Ed Harbison [D] | Rep. Lee Hawkins [R] |
Sen. Donald Thomas [R] | Sen. Tommie Williams [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #880 - Agree To House Substitute (Y: 34 N: 11 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2010-04-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #879 - Agree To House Substitute As Amended (Y: 27 N: 19 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2010-03-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #582 - Passage As Amended (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2010-04-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #879 - Agree To House Substitute As Amended (Y: 27 N: 19 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2010-03-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #582 - Passage As Amended (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2010-05-27 | Act 491 | |
2010-05-27 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-13 | Senate Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-29 | Senate Agrees House Amend or Sub | |
2010-04-27 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2010-04-27 | House Third Readers | |
2010-04-12 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-03-24 | House Second Readers | |
2010-03-22 | House First Readers | |
2010-03-18 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-03-18 | Senate Third Read | |
2010-03-16 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2010-03-11 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-02-18 | Senate Read and Referred |