GA SB429 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-29 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-29 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, so as to revise, modernize, correct errors or omissions in, and reenact the statutory portion of said Code, as amended, in furtherance of the work of the Code Revision Commission; to repeal portions of said Code, or Acts in amendment thereof, which have become obsolete, have been declared to be unconstitutional, or have been preempted or superseded by subsequent laws; to codify principles of law derived from decisions of the state Supreme Court; to provide for other matters relating to revision, reenactment, and publication of said Code; to provide for effect in event of conflicts; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Code Revision Commission; statutory portion of said Code; revise, modernize, correct errors or omissions in, and reenact
Sponsors
Sen. William Ligon [R] | Sen. Jesse Stone [R] | Sen. Randy Robertson [R] | Sen. Bill Cowsert [R] |
Rep. Timothy Barr [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-24 - House - House Vote #710 (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate Vote #532 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate Vote #532 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-29 | Effective Date | |
2020-07-29 | Act 521 | |
2020-07-29 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2020-06-24 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-24 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-06-18 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-03-09 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-03-05 | House | House First Readers |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Hopper |