GA SB427 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-22 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Intragovernmental Coordination Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-22 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Intragovernmental Coordination Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing a new charter for the City of Buford, approved June 3, 2003 (Ga. L. 2003, p. 4622), so as to change the corporate limits of the city; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Buford, City of; change corporate limits of the city
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-16 - Senate - Senate Vote #615 (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-22 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-03-16 | House | House First Readers |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Senate Hopper |