GA SB423 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-13 - House First Readers
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 16-5-61 of the O.C.G.A., relating to hazing, so as to provide for an expanded definition of hazing; to amend Chapter 1 of Title 20 of the O.C.G.A., relating to education generally; to amend Part 3 of Article 2 of Chapter 3 of Title 20 of the O.C.G.A., relating to student organization responsibility for drug abuse, so as to make student organizations responsible for hazing; to provide for and revise definitions; to provide for a short title; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"Max Gruver Act"; expanded definition of hazing; provide; enact

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #595 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-13HouseHouse First Readers
2020-03-12SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2020-03-12SenateSenate Third Read
2020-03-10SenateSenate Read Second Time
2020-03-09SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2020-02-24SenateSenate Read and Referred
2020-02-21SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback