GA SB421 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-16 - House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-16 - House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to create the DeKalb County Charter Review Commission; to provide for its membership, officers, purpose, meetings, hearings, functions, powers, expenses, and duties; to provide for a final report; to provide for the abolishment of such commission; to provide for definitions; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
DeKalb County Charter Review Commission; create; membership; purpose
Sponsors
Sen. Gloria Butler [D] | Sen. Elena Parent [D] | Sen. Steve Henson [D] | Sen. Gail Davenport [D] |
Sen. Emanuel Jones [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-16 - House - House Vote #760 (Y: 163 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #560 (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #560 (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-16 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-03-16 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-03-16 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-03-08 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-03-07 | House | House First Readers |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Senate Hopper |