GA SB418 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-15 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Public Safety and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-15 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Public Safety and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 1 of Article 5 of Chapter 9 of Title 45 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Georgia State Indemnification Fund, so as revise when indemnification shall be paid in instances of a heart attack, stroke, or vascular rupture suffered by a public safety officer resulting in certain disabilities or death; to provide for definitions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia State Indemnification Fund; when indemnification shall be paid in instances of a heart attack; public safety officer resulting in certain disabilities or death; revise
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Thompson [R] | Sen. John Albers [R] | Sen. Renee Unterman [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] |
Sen. Marty Harbin [R] | Sen. Ben Watson [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #600 (Y: 49 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #618 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #618 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-15 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-03-13 | House | House First Readers |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Senate Hopper |