GA SB413 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-17 - Effective Date 2022-02-17
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-17 - Effective Date 2022-02-17
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing a new Board of Education for Polk County, approved March 28, 1985 (Ga. L. 1985, p. 4985), as amended, particularly by an Act approved May 6, 2013 (Ga. L. 2013, p. 4160), so as to provide new district boundaries; to provide for a definition and inclusions; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Board of Education for Polk County; new district boundaries; provide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-14 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #510 (Y: 153 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #480 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #480 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | Effective Date 2022-02-17 | |
2022-02-17 | Act 387 | |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2022-02-14 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2022-02-14 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-02-14 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-02-11 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-02-10 | House | House First Readers |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate Transmitted House |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Senate Hopper |