GA SB412 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-17 - Effective Date 2022-02-17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-17 - Effective Date 2022-02-17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating a board of commissioners of roads and revenue in and for the County of Polk, approved August 19, 1919 (Ga. L. 1919, p. 719), as amended, particularly by an Act approved April 18, 2002 (Ga. L. 2002, p. 4037), so as to revise the districts for the election of members of the board of commissioners; to provide for a definition and inclusions; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Polk County; districts for the election of members of the board of commissioners; revise
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-14 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #510 (Y: 153 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #480 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #480 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | Effective Date 2022-02-17 | |
2022-02-17 | Act 386 | |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2022-02-14 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2022-02-14 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-02-14 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-02-11 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-02-10 | House | House First Readers |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate Transmitted House |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Senate Hopper |