GA SB41 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 4 of Title 26 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to pharmacists and pharmacies, so as to provide for the licensure of durable medical equipment suppliers; to provide for a definition; to provide for requirements for licensure; to provide for discipline and revocation; to provide for inspections; to provide for exemptions; to provide for rules and regulations; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Pharmacists and Pharmacies; durable medical equipment suppliers; provide for the licensure; definition; requirements; discipline and revocation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #332 (Y: 45 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Vote #329 (Y: 127 N: 43 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #47 (Y: 40 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Vote #329 (Y: 127 N: 43 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #47 (Y: 40 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2017-05-09 | Act 230 | |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2017-03-28 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2017-03-28 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-03-24 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-02-16 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-15 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate Hopper |