GA SB406 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 10 of Chapter 3 of Title 38 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to state-wide first responder building mapping information system, so as to establish a grant program to fund the creation of school mapping data for inclusion in the state-wide first responder building mapping information system; to provide for standards for school mapping data; to provide for a definition; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
First Responder Building Mapping Information System; grant program to fund the creation of school mapping data; establish
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-08 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #481 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-02-12 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-02-09 | House | House First Readers |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Senate Hopper |