GA SB406 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-07 - Act 420
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-07 - Act 420
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 31 of the O.C.G.A., relating to health, so as to enact the "Georgia Long-term Care Background Check Program" and to promote public safety and provide for comprehensive criminal background checks for owners, applicants for employment, and employees providing care or owning a personal care home, assisted living community, private home care provider, home health agency, hospice care, nursing home, skilled nursing facility, or an adult day care as recommended by the Georgia Council on Criminal Justice from liability; to amend Article 1 of Chapter 2 of Title 49 of the O.C.G.A., relating to general provisions for the Department of Human Services; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
"Georgia Long-term Care Background Check Program" enact; public safety; promote
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Strickland [R] | Sen. Larry Walker [R] | Sen. Jesse Stone [R] | Sen. Butch Miller [R] |
Sen. P.K. Martin [R] | Sen. John Kennedy [R] | Rep. Chuck Efstration [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #783 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Vote #704 (Y: 163 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #512 (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Vote #704 (Y: 163 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #512 (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-07 | Act 420 | |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2018-03-15 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-03-15 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-03-09 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-03-01 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-02-28 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Senate Hopper |