GA SB404 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-07 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Public Safety and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-07 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Public Safety and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 2 of Title 35 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Department of Public Safety, so as to revise provisions for the off-duty use of motor vehicles by certain law enforcement officers of the department relative to approved off-duty employment; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Public Safety Department; off-duty use of motor vehicles by certain law enforcement officers; revise provisions
Sponsors
Sen. Tyler Harper [R] | Sen. John Albers [R] | Sen. Michael Dugan [R] | Sen. Harold Jones [D] |
Sen. Ben Watson [R] | Sen. Michael Williams [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #535 (Y: 47 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-07 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-03-02 | House | House First Readers |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted As Amended |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Senate Hopper |