GA SB400 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Senate Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Senate Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 20-2-161.3 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the "Move on When Ready Act" and dual credit courses, so as to require the Office of Student Achievement to establish objectives and participation targets for the program; to require the Office of Student Achievement to annually measure and evaluate the program and report certain data and analysis related to the program to the Governor and the General Assembly; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
"Move on When Ready Act" and Dual Credit Courses; Office of Student Achievement to establish objectives and participation targets for the program; require
Sponsors
Sen. Elena Parent [D] | Sen. Steve Henson [D] | Sen. Sally Harrell [D] | Sen. Gloria Butler [D] |
Sen. Emanuel Jones [D] | Sen. Gail Davenport [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #600 (Y: 49 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate Hopper |