GA SB40 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-25 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Special Committee on Election Integrity Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-25 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Special Committee on Election Integrity Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 2 of Title 21 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to elections and primaries generally, so as to revise the time and method for opening and tabulating absentee ballots; to provide for an effective date; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Elections and Primaries; the time and method for opening and tabulating absentee ballots; revise
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-23 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #63 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Motion To Engross: Sb 40, Sb 67, Sb 184, & Sb 188: Senate Vote #60 (Y: 32 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Motion To Engross: Sb 40, Sb 67, Sb 184, & Sb 188: Senate Vote #60 (Y: 32 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-25 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-02-24 | House | House First Readers |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Senate Hopper |