GA SB40 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-30 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-30 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 3 of Chapter 3 of Title 37 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to examination, hospitalization, and treatment of involuntary patients, so as to provide for authorization of emergency medical services personnel to transport certain mentally ill patients under certain circumstances; to provide for reporting requirements; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Mental Health; transport certain mentally ill patients; authorization of emergency medical services personnel
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate Vote #45 (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-30 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2017-03-22 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-02-15 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-14 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate Hopper |