GA SB40 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-14 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-14 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 3 of Chapter 10 of Title 13 of the O.C.G.A., relating to security and immigration compliance, so as to provide penalties for the failure of a public employer to utilize the federal work authorization program; to provide for definitions; to amend Article 2 of Chapter 10 of Title 16 of the O.C.G.A., relating to obstruction of public administration and related offenses, so as to provide for the state offense for failure of an alien to carry a certificate of registration as required by federal law; to amend Chapter 5 of Title 17 of the O.C.G.A., relating to searches and seizures, so as to provide for the arrest of illegal aliens; to amend Code Section 50-36-1 of the O.C.G.A., relating to verification of lawful presence within the United States for receipt of certain government benefits, so as to provide penalties for the failure of an agency head to verify the lawful immigration status of certain applicants for public benefits; and for other purposes.
Title
Public Contracts; provide penalties for the failure of a public employer to utilize the federal work authorization program
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Gooch [R] | Sen. Bill Heath [R] | Sen. Butch Miller [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] |
Sen. Jack Murphy [R] | Sen. Chip Rogers [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #123 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 34 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #122 - Adoption Of Amendment #5 By Senator From The 21st To Committee Sub (Y: 30 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #121 - Adoption Of Amendment #2 By The Senator From The 11th (Y: 26 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-03-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #120 - Adoption Of Amendment #2 By Senator From The 11th To Committee Sub (Y: 27 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-03-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #122 - Adoption Of Amendment #5 By Senator From The 21st To Committee Sub (Y: 30 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #121 - Adoption Of Amendment #2 By The Senator From The 11th (Y: 26 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-03-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #120 - Adoption Of Amendment #2 By Senator From The 11th To Committee Sub (Y: 27 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-14 | House Withdrawn, Recommitted | |
2011-03-28 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-03-22 | House Second Readers | |
2011-03-21 | House First Readers | |
2011-03-14 | Senate Notice to Reconsider | |
2011-03-14 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2011-03-14 | Senate Third Read | |
2011-03-04 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2011-03-03 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-02-03 | Senate Read and Referred |