GA SB397 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-05 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 3 of Chapter 27 of Title 50 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to bona fide coin operated amusement machines, so as to change the number of bona fide coin operated amusement machines that may be prohibited in local ordinance; to increase the percentage of net receipts of bona fide coin operated amusement machine proceeds to be paid to the Georgia Lottery Corporation; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Bona Fide Coin Operated Amusement Machines; number that may be prohibited in local ordinance; change

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-05SenateSenate Read Second Time
2020-03-04SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2020-02-20SenateSenate Read and Referred
2020-02-19SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback