GA SB397 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Act 363
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 37 of Title 36 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the acquisition and disposition of real and personal property generally, so as to allow municipalities to hire state licensed real estate brokers to assist in the sale of real property; to provide for the duties of the state licensed real estate broker; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Real and Personal Property; municipalities to hire state licensed real estate brokers to assist in sale; allow

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #795 (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-23 - House - House Vote #752 (Y: 156 N: 1 NV: 15 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate Vote #487 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-03 Act 363
2018-05-03SenateSenate Date Signed by Governor
2018-04-05SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2018-03-29SenateSenate Agreed House Amend or Sub
2018-03-23HouseHouse Passed/Adopted As Amended
2018-03-23HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-03-15HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2018-02-28HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-02-26HouseHouse First Readers
2018-02-23SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2018-02-23SenateSenate Third Read
2018-02-21SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-02-20SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2018-02-08SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-02-07SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback