GA SB397 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session


Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]


A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 37 of Title 36 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the acquisition and disposition of real and personal property generally, so as to allow municipalities to hire state licensed real estate brokers to assist in the sale of real property; to provide for the duties of the state licensed real estate broker; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Real and Personal Property; municipalities to hire state licensed real estate brokers to assist in sale; allow


Roll Calls

2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate Vote #487 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]


2018-03-15HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2018-02-28HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-02-26HouseHouse First Readers
2018-02-23SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2018-02-23SenateSenate Third Read
2018-02-21SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-02-20SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2018-02-08SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-02-07SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources

Bill Comments