GA SB397 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing for districts for the election of the Board of Education of Hall County, approved March 29, 1983 (Ga. L. 1983, p. 4553), as amended, particularly by an Act approved April 25, 2002 (Ga. L. 2002, p. 4915), so as to change the description of the education districts; to provide for definitions and inclusions; to provide for the continuation in office of current members; to provide for the submission of this Act under Section 5 of the federal Voting Rights Act of 1965, as amended; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Board of Education of Hall County; change the description of the education districts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-24 - House - House Vote #533 - Local Calendar (Y: 124 N: 10 NV: 23 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - Senate - Senate Vote #470 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - Senate - Senate Vote #470 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-01 | Effective Date | |
2012-03-01 | Act 322 | |
2012-03-01 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-02-27 | Senate Sent to Governor | |
2012-02-24 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-02-24 | House Third Readers | |
2012-02-24 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-17 | House Second Readers | |
2012-02-16 | House First Readers | |
2012-02-15 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-02-15 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-07 | Senate Read and Referred |