GA SB396 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-12 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-12 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 1A of Article 2 of Chapter 5 of Title 46 of the O.C.G.A., relating to telephone system for the physically impaired, so as to change certain provisions relating to the establishment, administration, and operation of the state-wide dual party relay service and audible universal information access service; to change certain legislative findings and declarations; to modify the prohibition as to the distribution of telecommunications equipment under the telecommunications equipment distribution program based on a certain income level; to provide that wireless devices and applications may be distributed as part of the telecommunications equipment distribution program; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Telephone System For Physically Impaired; state-wide dual party relay service and audible universal information access service; change provisions
Sponsors
Sen. David Shafer [R] | Sen. Frank Ginn [R] | Sen. William Ligon [R] | Sen. Renee Unterman [R] |
Sen. Chuck Payne [R] | Sen. Lee Anderson [R] | Rep. Don Parsons [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #549 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-12 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-03-05 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-03-01 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Senate Hopper |