GA SB391 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-02 - Effective Date 2022-03-02
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-02 - Effective Date 2022-03-02
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating the Board of Commissioners of Jeff Davis County, approved March 25, 1958 (Ga. L. 1958, p. 3288), as amended, particularly by an Act approved April 4, 2012 (Ga. L. 2012, p. 4672), so as to change the description of the commissioner districts; to provide for definitions and inclusions; to provide for continuation in office of current members; to provide for election and terms of office of subsequent members; to provide for related matters; to provide for effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Board of Commissioners of Jeff Davis County; description of the commissioner districts; change
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-24 - Senate - Agree To House Substitute: Senate Vote #557 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #506 (Y: 144 N: 7 NV: 8 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #471 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #506 (Y: 144 N: 7 NV: 8 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #471 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-02 | Effective Date 2022-03-02 | |
2022-03-02 | Act 540 | |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2022-02-11 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2022-02-11 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-02-11 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-02-08 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-02-07 | House | House First Readers |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Senate Transmitted House |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Senate Hopper |