GA SB39 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-21 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-21 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 16-6-13 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to penalties for violating Code Sections 16-6-9 through 16-6-12, so as to increase the penalty provisions relating to pimping and pandering; to amend Code Section 42-1-12 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the State Sexual Offender Registry, so as to require registration on the State Sexual Offender Registry when an individual is convicted for the second time for pandering; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Pimping and Pandering; increase the penalty provisions
Sponsors
Sen. Renee Unterman [R] | Sen. David Shafer [R] | Sen. Brandon Beach [R] | Sen. Nan Orrock [D] |
Sen. Gloria Butler [D] | Sen. Judson Hill [R] | Rep. Albert Reeves [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #536 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-03-05 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-03-01 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate Hopper |