GA SB389 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-29 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-29 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing for the composition of the Board of Education of Decatur County, approved March 18, 1986 (Ga. L. 1986, p. 4096), as amended, particularly by an Act approved May 13, 2002 (Ga. L. 2002, p. 5782), so as to change the description of the education districts; to provide for definitions and inclusions; to provide for continuation in office of current members; to provide for election and terms of office of subsequent members; to provide for submission of this Act for preclearance under the federal Voting Rights Act of 1965, as amended; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Board of Education of Decatur County; change the description of the education districts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-23 - House - House Vote #525 - Local Calendar (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - Senate - Senate Vote #474 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - Senate - Senate Vote #474 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-29 | Effective Date | |
2012-02-29 | Act 319 | |
2012-02-29 | Senate Sent to Governor | |
2012-02-29 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-02-23 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-02-23 | House Third Readers | |
2012-02-23 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-21 | House Second Readers | |
2012-02-17 | House First Readers | |
2012-02-16 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-02-16 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-07 | Senate Read and Referred |