GA SB376 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Act 356
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Act 356
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 34 of Chapter 1 of Title 10 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to identity theft, so as to prohibit consumer credit reporting agencies from charging a fee for placing or removing a security freeze on a consumer's account; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Identity Theft; consumer credit reporting agencies charging a fee for placing/removing a security freeze; prohibit
Sponsors
Sen. David Shafer [R] | Sen. Gregory Kirk [R] | Sen. John Albers [R] | Sen. Bruce Thompson [R] |
Sen. Bill Heath [R] | Sen. Frank Ginn [R] | Rep. Scot Turner [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - House - House Vote #802 (Y: 168 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #807 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #511 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #807 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #511 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | Act 356 | |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2018-03-29 | House | House Passed/Adopted As Amended |
2018-03-29 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-03-12 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-03-01 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-02-28 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Senate Hopper |