GA SB374 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 8 of Chapter 11 of Title 9 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to provisional and final remedies and special proceedings, so as to revise and provide for new requirements under the "Georgia Civil Practice Act" for settlement offers and arrangements for all tort claims for personal injury, bodily injury, and death; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Final Remedies and Special Proceedings; new requirements under the "Georgia Civil Practice Act" for settlement offers and arrangements; revise and provide
Sponsors
Sen. John Kennedy [R] | Sen. Butch Miller [R] | Sen. Michael Dugan [R] | Sen. Steve Gooch [R] |
Sen. Larry Walker [R] | Sen. Bill Cowsert [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #508 (Y: 27 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #509 (Y: 26 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #510 (Y: 23 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #511 (Y: 36 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #512 (Y: 35 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #509 (Y: 26 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #510 (Y: 23 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #511 (Y: 36 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #512 (Y: 35 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-03-03 | House | House First Readers |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted As Amended |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Senate Hopper |