GA SB367 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 12 of Article 6 of Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to effectiveness of educational programs, so as to reduce the number of student assessments; to provide for when assessments must be administered; to provide for analysis of locally implemented assessments; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Effectiveness of Educational Programs; number of student assessments; reduce; when assessments must be administered; provide
Sponsors
Sen. P.K. Martin [R] | Sen. Brian Strickland [R] | Sen. Blake Tillery [R] | Sen. Kay Kirkpatrick [R] |
Sen. Matt Brass [R] | Sen. Brandon Beach [R] | Rep. Rick Jasperse [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #744 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - House Vote #718 (Y: 151 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #521 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - House Vote #718 (Y: 151 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #521 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-01 | Effective Date | |
2020-07-22 | Act 485 | |
2020-07-22 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2020-06-24 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-06-24 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-06-23 | House | House Postponed |
2020-06-19 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-03-05 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-03-04 | House | House First Readers |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Senate Hopper |