GA SB364 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Act 354
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Act 354
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 43-34-103 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to delegation of authority to physician assistants, so as to authorize a higher supervisory ratio for physician assistants who have completed a board approved anesthesiologist assistant program; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Delegation of Authority to Physician Assistants; higher supervisory ratio; completed a board approve anesthesiologist assistant program; authorize
Sponsors
Sen. Chuck Hufstetler [R] | Sen. Renee Unterman [R] | Sen. Kay Kirkpatrick [R] | Sen. Nan Orrock [D] |
Sen. Dean Burke [R] | Rep. Trey Kelley [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-27 - House - House Vote #781 (Y: 160 N: 1 NV: 11 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate Vote #483 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate Vote #483 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | Act 354 | |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2018-03-27 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2018-03-27 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-03-12 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-02-23 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-02-22 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Senate Hopper |