GA SB364 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-28 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-28 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 11 of Title 15 and Part 1 of Article 2 of Chapter 13 of Title 16 of the O.C.G.A., relating to the Juvenile Code and schedules, offenses, and penalties, respectively, so as to revise and correct errors or omissions in furtherance of the work of the Georgia Council on Criminal Justice Reform to recommend legislation; to amend Code Section 19-7-1 of the O.C.G.A., relating to in whom parental power lies and how such power may be lost, so as to correct a cross-reference; to provide for related matters; to provide for effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Juvenile Code; revise and correct errors or omissions
Sponsors
Sen. Jesse Stone [R] | Sen. Charlie Bethel [R] | Sen. William Jackson [R] | Sen. Butch Miller [R] |
Sen. John Crosby [R] | Sen. Bill Cowsert [R] | Rep. Tom Weldon [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #779 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - House - House Vote #813 (Y: 165 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #516 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - House - House Vote #813 (Y: 165 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #516 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-28 | Effective Date | |
2014-04-28 | Act 635 | |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Agrees House Amend or Sub |
2014-03-18 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2014-03-18 | House | House Third Readers |
2014-03-13 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2014-03-04 | House | House Second Readers |
2014-03-03 | House | House First Readers |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Senate Hopper |