GA SB364 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 24A of Title 43 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to massage therapy practice, so as to provide that, upon conviction for a sexual offense, a person's massage therapist license shall be suspended for certain time periods; to provide for reinstatement under certain circumstances; to increase penalties for violations; to provide for local regulation in addition to state regulation; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Massage Therapist; conviction for sexual offense; license suspended for certain time periods; penalties
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Brown [D] | Sen. Ronnie Chance [R] | Sen. John Douglas [R] | Sen. Jack Murphy [R] |
Sen. Cecil Staton [R] | Sen. Renee Unterman [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #919 - Agree To House Substitute (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-03-17 - Senate - Senate Vote #561 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-03-17 - Senate - Senate Vote #561 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2010-05-24 | Act 444 | |
2010-05-24 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-13 | Senate Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-29 | Senate Agrees House Amend or Sub | |
2010-04-27 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2010-04-27 | House Third Readers | |
2010-04-20 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-03-22 | House Second Readers | |
2010-03-18 | House First Readers | |
2010-03-17 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-03-17 | Senate Third Read | |
2010-03-16 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2010-03-11 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-02-05 | Senate Read and Referred |