GA SB363 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-29 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-29 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating the Board of Commissioners of Thomas County, approved December 21, 1898 (Ga. L. 1898, p. 378), as amended, particularly by an Act approved April 25, 2002 (Ga. L. 2002, p. 4203), so as to change the description of the commissioner districts; to provide for definitions and inclusions; to provide for the continuation in office of the current members; to provide for the submission of this Act for preclearance under Section 5 of the federal Voting Rights Act of 1965, as amended; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Board of Commissioners of Thomas County; change description of the commissioner districts; definitions and inclusions
Sponsors
Sen. John Bulloch [R] | Sen. Tim Golden [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-17 - House - House Vote #496 - Local Calendar (Y: 169 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - Senate - Senate Vote #453 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - Senate - Senate Vote #453 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-29 | Effective Date | |
2012-02-29 | Act 317 | |
2012-02-29 | Senate Sent to Governor | |
2012-02-29 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-02-17 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-02-17 | House Third Readers | |
2012-02-17 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-08 | House Second Readers | |
2012-02-07 | House First Readers | |
2012-02-06 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-02-06 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-01-31 | Senate Read and Referred |