GA SB362 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Enrolled on June 29 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Senate Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 3 of Title 4 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to livestock running at large or straying, so as to change the fees for impounding animals and disposing of impounded animals; to provide for an effective date; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Livestock Running at Large or Straying; impounding animals and disposing of impounded animals; change the fees

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-17 - House - House Vote #654 (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #500 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-29SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2020-06-17HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2020-06-17HouseHouse Third Readers
2020-03-12HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2020-03-03HouseHouse Second Readers
2020-03-02HouseHouse First Readers
2020-02-28SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2020-02-28SenateSenate Third Read
2020-02-19SenateSenate Read Second Time
2020-02-18SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2020-02-05SenateSenate Read and Referred
2020-02-04SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback