GA SB360 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to provide a new charter for the City of Stockbridge, approved April 4, 1991 (Ga. L. 1991, p. 4359), as amended, so as to prohibit the mayor and councilmembers from holding any other elective or appointive office in the city or otherwise be employed by said government or any agency thereof during the term for which that official was elected; to prohibit any former mayor or former councilmember from holding any appointive office in the city or being employed by the city until one year after the expiration of the term for which that official was elected; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
City of Stockbridge; prohibit the mayor and councilmembers from holding any other elective/appointive office during the term that official was elected
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-08 - House - House Vote #721 (Y: 163 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate Vote #484 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate Vote #484 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | Effective Date | |
2016-04-26 | Act 390 | |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2016-03-08 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2016-03-08 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-03-08 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-02-25 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-02-24 | House | House First Readers |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Senate Hopper |