GA SB36 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-03 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-03 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 3 of Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to local boards of education, so as to provide for the adoption of codes of ethics to govern members of local boards of education; to provide for annual review of such codes of ethics; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Local Boards of Education; provide for adoption of codes of ethics to govern members; annual review of such codes
Sponsors
Sen. Gail Buckner [D] | Sen. John Douglas [R] | Sen. Emanuel Jones [D] | Sen. Valencia Seay [D] |
Sen. Freddie Sims [D] | Sen. Horacena Tate [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #205 - Passage (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-03 | House Withdrawn, Recommitted | |
2009-03-26 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-18 | House Second Readers | |
2009-03-17 | House First Readers | |
2009-03-12 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-12 | Senate Third Read | |
2009-03-10 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2009-03-09 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-01-26 | Senate Read and Referred |