GA SB359 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-05 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-05 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 33 of the O.C.G.A., relating to insurance, so as to establish standards for carriers and health care providers with regard to payment under a managed care plan in the provision of emergency medical care; to provide for applicability; to provide for related matters; to provide for a short title; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
"Consumer Coverage and Protection for Out-of-Network Medical Care Act"
Sponsors
Sen. Chuck Hufstetler [R] | Sen. Dean Burke [R] | Sen. Ben Watson [R] | Sen. Kay Kirkpatrick [R] |
Sen. Steve Henson [D] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #532 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-05 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-03-01 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn & Recommitted |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Senate Hopper |