GA SB358 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-12 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-12 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 60 of Title 36 and Code Section 45-8-14 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions relative to provisions applicable to counties and municipal corporations and depositories for county and school district moneys, respectively, so as to provide for the establishment of banking improvement zones to encourage opening of financial institutions in areas underserved by financial institutions; to provide for definitions; to provide for application and standards of approval for a banking improvement zone; to provide for the establishment of an agreement for the deposit of public funds in financial institutions within a banking improvement zone; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Counties/Municipal Corporations; establishment of banking improvement zones; agreement for deposit of public funds; provide
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Rhett [D] | Sen. John Kennedy [R] | Sen. William Ligon [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] |
Sen. Harold Jones [D] | Rep. Earl Ehrhart [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #557 (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-12 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-03-05 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-03-01 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Senate Hopper |