GA SB358 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to provide a new charter for the City of Stockbridge, approved April 4, 1991 (Ga. L. 1991, p. 4359), as amended, particularly by an Act approved May 6, 2005 (Ga. L. 2005, p. 3832), so as to provide for an oath of office and its administration; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
City of Stockbridge; provide for an oath of office and its administration
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-08 - House - House Vote #721 (Y: 163 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate Vote #484 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate Vote #484 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | Effective Date | |
2016-04-26 | Act 388 | |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2016-03-08 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2016-03-08 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-03-08 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-02-25 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-02-24 | House | House First Readers |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Senate Hopper |