GA SB355 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Regulated Industries Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Regulated Industries Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 43 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to professions and businesses, so as to change certain provisions relating to certain boxing, wrestling, and martial art associations and federations; to revise a definition; to change the applicability of certain provisions as to matches, contests, or exhibitions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Professions and Businesses; certain boxing, wrestling, and martial art associations and federations; provisions; change
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #545 (Y: 39 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-03-09 | House | House First Readers |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Senate Hopper |