GA SB353 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-03 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-03 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 13 of Title 16 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to controlled substances, so as to change certain provisions relating to Schedule I, II, IV, and V controlled substances; to change certain provisions relating to the definition of "dangerous drug"; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Controlled Substances; Schedule I, II, IV, and V; definition of "dangerous drug"; provisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-17 - Senate - Senate Vote #511 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-03 | Effective Date | |
2010-06-03 | Act 619 | |
2010-06-03 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-03 | Senate Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-12 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2010-04-12 | House Third Readers | |
2010-03-31 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-03-08 | House Second Readers | |
2010-02-18 | House First Readers | |
2010-02-17 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-02-17 | Senate Third Read | |
2010-02-16 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2010-02-11 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-02-03 | Senate Read and Referred |