GA SB348 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-21 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-21 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 4 of Title 20 and Chapter 8 of Title 20 of the O.C.G.A., relating to technical and adult education and to campus policemen, respectively, so as to revise the powers of arrest of campus policemen who are regular employees of the Technical College System of Georgia; to amend Title 36 of the O.C.G.A., relating to local government, so as to permit campus policemen of the Technical College System of Georgia to render mutual aid under certain conditions; to provide for the public safety director or chief of police of any institution within the Technical College System of Georgia to enter into mutual aid agreements with local governments under certain conditions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Technical College System of Georgia; powers of arrest of campus policemen who are regular employees; revise
Sponsors
Sen. Tyler Harper [R] | Sen. John Albers [R] | Sen. Michael Dugan [R] | Sen. Tonya Anderson [D] |
Sen. Matt Brass [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] | Rep. Rick Jasperse [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #452 (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-02-20 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-02-15 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted As Amended |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Senate Hopper |