GA SB348 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-07 - Senate Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-07 - Senate Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 9-11-4 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to process, so as to change provisions relating to personal service of a summons on a corporation; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Civil Practice; personal service of a summons on a corporation; provisions
Sponsors
Sen. Jason Carter [D] | Sen. Ronnie Chance [R] | Sen. George Hooks [D] | Sen. Emanuel Jones [D] |
Sen. Freddie Sims [D] | Rep. Doug Stoner [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-07 | Senate Tabled | |
2012-03-07 | Senate Third Read | |
2012-02-02 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2012-02-01 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-01-26 | Senate Read and Referred |