GA SB347 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-17 - Effective Date 2022-02-17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-17 - Effective Date 2022-02-17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act reconstituting the Board of Commissioners of White County, approved May 13, 2008 (Ga. L. 2008, p. 4205), as amended, so as to provide new commissioner districts; to provide for definitions and inclusions; to provide for continuation in office of current members; to provide for related matters; to provide for effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
White County; new commissioner districts; provide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-07 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #486 (Y: 148 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #458 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #458 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | Effective Date 2022-02-17 | |
2022-02-17 | Act 398 | |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2022-02-07 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2022-02-07 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-02-07 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-02-01 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-01-27 | House | House First Readers |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Senate Hopper |