GA SB342 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Veto V20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 2 of Title 40 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to registration and licensing of motor vehicles generally, so as to permit the owner or operator of a vehicle which has a valid number license plate without the required revalidation decal affixed to the plate to retain custody of the vehicle under certain conditions; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Licensing of Motor Vehicles; owner with valid license plate without the required revalidation decal to retain custody of vehicle under certain conditions; permit

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #792 (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - House - House Vote #748 (Y: 167 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate Vote #445 (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08 Veto V20
2018-05-08SenateSenate Date Signed by Governor
2018-04-05SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2018-03-29SenateSenate Agreed House Amend or Sub
2018-03-21HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-03-21HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-03-19HouseHouse Postponed
2018-03-14HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-02-15HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-02-14HouseHouse First Readers
2018-02-13SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2018-02-13SenateSenate Third Read
2018-02-12SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-02-08SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2018-01-23SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-01-22SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback