GA SB342 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide for a homestead exemption from City of Decatur ad valorem taxes for municipal purposes except for ad valorem taxes levied to pay interest on and to retire municipal bonded indebtedness in the amount of $15,000.00 of the assessed value of the homestead for residents of that city who are 62 years of age or older and whose income does not exceed $50,000.00; to provide for definitions; to specify the terms and conditions of the exemption and the procedures relating thereto; to provide for applicability; to provide for a referendum, effective dates, and automatic repeal; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Decatur, City of; provide for homestead exemption; municipal purposes; specify terms and conditions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-08 - House - House Vote #721 (Y: 163 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate Vote #449 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate Vote #449 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | Effective Date | |
2016-04-26 | Act 385 | |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2016-03-08 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2016-03-08 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-03-08 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-02-17 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-02-16 | House | House First Readers |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Senate Hopper |