GA SB338 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on January 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-30 - Effective Date 2024-01-30
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on January 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-30 - Effective Date 2024-01-30
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing for the election of members of the Board of Education of Cobb County, approved March 28, 1974 (Ga. L. 1974, p. 3516), as amended, particularly by an Act approved March 2, 2022 (Ga. L. 2022, p. 5274), so as to change the description of the education districts of such board; to provide for definitions and inclusions; to provide for continuation in office of current members; to provide for the manner of election; to provide an effective date; to repeal a specific Act; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Board of Education of Cobb County; education districts; change the description
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-29 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #414 (Y: 96 N: 71 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - Remove From Local Cal/vote Separately: House Vote #413 (Y: 71 N: 95 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2024-01-24 - Senate - Motion To Immediately Transmit: Senate Vote #421 (Y: 32 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #420 (Y: 32 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - Senate - Motion To Engross: Senate Vote #418 (Y: 29 N: 16 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - Remove From Local Cal/vote Separately: House Vote #413 (Y: 71 N: 95 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2024-01-24 - Senate - Motion To Immediately Transmit: Senate Vote #421 (Y: 32 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #420 (Y: 32 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - Senate - Motion To Engross: Senate Vote #418 (Y: 29 N: 16 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-30 | Effective Date 2024-01-30 | |
2024-01-30 | Act 354 | |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2024-01-29 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2024-01-29 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-01-29 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-01-26 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-01-25 | House | House First Readers |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Senate Hopper |